Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Applied Behavior Analysis Services – Reimbursement
Sponsored by
Senator Washington
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 772
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Maryland Department of Health from conditioning reimbursement of applied behavior analysis services provided to Maryland Medical Assistance Program recipients on the presence or availability of the parent or caregiver of the Program recipient in the setting where the applied behavior analysis services are provided to the Program recipient; providing that a certain provision of the Act does not prohibit the Department from establishing reasonable standards for the involvement of a parent or caregiver; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0598
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {757475/1 Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
32AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
4/06/2021
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 772
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Applied Behavior Analysis Services – Reimbursement
Senate 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2021 3/25/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/25/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments {757475/1 Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2021 3/05/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Applied Behavior Analysis Services – Reimbursement
Senate 3/26/2021 3/06/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2021 3/13/2021 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 32AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 4/06/2021 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 772
Text - Chapter - Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Applied Behavior Analysis Services – Reimbursement
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 11:53 AM
Click to return on the top page