Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Center for Firearm Violence Prevention and Intervention - Establishment
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Augustine, Beidle, Brooks, Carter, Charles, Elfreth, Ferguson, Gile, Hester, Hettleman, Lam, Rosapepe, Waldstreicher, M. Washington, West, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Center for Firearm Violence Prevention in the Maryland Department of Health to reduce firearm violence, harm from firearm violence, and misuse of firearms in the State by partnering with federal, State, and local agencies and affected communities to implement a public health approach to firearm violence reduction; requiring the Center, by May 1, 2025, to submit to the Governor and the General Assembly a preliminary State Plan for a Public Health Approach to Reducing Firearm Violence; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0583
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2024
Legislative Date
1/22/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Center for Firearm Violence Prevention - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/11 (Senator McKay) Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Center for Firearm Violence Prevention - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-11)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {953126/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-34)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-12)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2024 1/22/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Center for Firearm Violence Prevention - Establishment
Senate 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2024 3/07/2024 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/08/2024 2/25/2024 Favorable 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2024 2/25/2024 Motion Special Order until 3/11 (Senator McKay) Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2024 2/26/2024 Second Reading Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Center for Firearm Violence Prevention - Establishment
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Third Reading Passed (35-11) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Referred Judiciary 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2024 3/29/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/29/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable with Amendments {953126/1 Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2024 3/16/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (101-34) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Senate Concurs House Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Third Reading Passed (35-12) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Center for Firearm Violence Prevention and Intervention - Establishment
(   13-5201 through 13-5205 )
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 4:10 PM
Click to return on the top page