Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Allegany County - Orphans' Court Judges - Pension Formula
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Extending the number of years of service from 16 to 24 that may be used as a multiplier in a formula to determine the pension provided an Orphans' Court judge in Allegany County; and providing for the prospective application of the Act.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0720
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Allegany County - Orphans' Court Judges - Pension Formula
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {718477/1
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Madaleno) Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {718477/1 Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Allegany County - Orphans' Court Judges - Pension Formula
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Allegany County - Orphans' Court Judges - Pension Formula
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Allegany County - Orphans' Court Judges - Pension Formula
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {718477/1 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Motion Laid Over (Senator Madaleno) Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments {718477/1 Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Allegany County - Orphans' Court Judges - Pension Formula
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Referred Appropriations 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/23/2018 3/18/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Text - Chapter - Allegany County - Orphans' Court Judges - Pension Formula
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page