Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Elections – Ranked–Choice Voting – Contests for Presidential Nomination in 2028
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that, in the 2028 statewide primary election, each contest for the nomination by a political party of a candidate for the office of President of the United States be conducted using ranked-choice voting; and requiring the State Board of Elections to develop and pay the cost of a certain voter education campaign and conduct and pay the cost of a survey of voters after the primary election to gauge the satisfaction of the voters with ranked-choice voting.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2024
Legislative Date
1/24/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2024 1/24/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Elections – Ranked–Choice Voting – Contests for Presidential Nomination in 2028
Senate 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 9:00 a.m.
Senate 2/28/2024 2/28/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/28/2024 2/28/2024 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
(   8-206 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:49 PM
Click to return on the top page