Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Gaming - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Licensee Payments
Sponsored by
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Lottery and Gaming Control Agency)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 445
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission adopt regulations to allow a video lottery operation licensee to reduce proceeds from video lottery terminals and table games if a video lottery operation licensee returns to successful players more than the amount of money bet through video lottery terminals or table games on a specified day; and requiring the regulations to provide for the length of time that any reduction may be carried forward.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0090
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Gaming - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Licensee Payments
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Gaming - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Licensee Payments
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {555969/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/31 (Delegate Barkley) Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {833323/1 (Delegate Barkley) Rejected (22-109)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {843123/1 (Delegate Gutierrez) Rejected
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (114-26)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (118-18)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
House Recede
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Motion Recede (Delegate Turner) Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 445
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Gaming - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Licensee Payments
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Gaming - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Licensee Payments
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Gaming - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Licensee Payments
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Referred Ways and Means 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable with Amendments {555969/1 Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Motion Special Order until 03/31 (Delegate Barkley) Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Floor Amendment {833323/1 (Delegate Barkley) Rejected (22-109) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Floor Amendment {843123/1 (Delegate Gutierrez) Rejected 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (114-26) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Senate Requests House Recede 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Senate Requests House Recede 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (118-18) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 House Recede 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Motion Recede (Delegate Turner) Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 445
Text - Chapter - Gaming - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Licensee Payments
(   9-1A-01, 9-1A-26 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page