Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Children - Therapeutic Child Care Grant Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senator King
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 498
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Therapeutic Child Care Grant Program to provide grants to providers specializing in child care and early childhood education to children under the age of 6 years who have delays in development, physical disabilities, or delays in social, emotional, or behavioral functioning; requiring certain providers who received certain grants to report certain information to the State Department of Education; requiring the Department to compile certain information and report to certain committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0725
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2022
Legislative Date
1/28/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Children - Therapeutic Child Care Program - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Children - Therapeutic Child Care Program - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {683624/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {783424/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (40-94)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Children - Therapeutic Child Care Grant Program - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 498
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Children - Therapeutic Child Care Grant Program - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2022 1/28/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Children - Therapeutic Child Care Program - Funding
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/07/2022 2/08/2022 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/21/2022 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/21/2022 3/09/2022 Favorable Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/09/2022 Second Reading Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Children - Therapeutic Child Care Program - Funding
Senate 3/21/2022 3/10/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2022 3/16/2022 Referred Ways and Means 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Favorable with Amendments {683624/1 Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Floor Amendment {783424/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (40-94) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Children - Therapeutic Child Care Grant Program - Establishment
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 498
Text - Chapter - Children - Therapeutic Child Care Grant Program - Establishment
Age
(   8-420 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:58 PM
Click to return on the top page