Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 12/1/2021 11:39:51 AM
Wednesday, December 1, 2021
Senate
Created: 12/1/2021 8:13 AM
Reapportionment and Redistricting - Bill Hearing
8:50 AM - Zoom / YouTube
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Sens Waldstreicher and Ready

OIS Test

House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Assessment and Funding of School Facilities, Workgroup on the
Created: 11/29/2021 10:04 AM
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Board of Public Works
Created: 10/21/2021 12:54 PM
10:00 AM - Virtual/In Person Meeting
To reach livestream click here
10 AM-Governor's Reception Room, 2nd Fl, State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis (Limited Capacity)
For participation details, please contact BPW staff at email.bpw@maryland.gov
General Meeting

House Cannabis Referendum and Legalization Workgroup
Created: 9/27/2021 1:42 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
10:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Presentation and Discussion on Cannabis and Taxation.

Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee
Created: 7/29/2021 4:28 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Audit: Maryland Transportation Authority (September 2021)
(Added - 11/18/2021 12:06 PM)
Audit: State Grants (November 2021)
(Added - 11/18/2021 12:06 PM)
Office of Legislative Audits (OLA): Fraud Investigation Unit Update and Results
(Added - 11/18/2021 12:06 PM)
OLA: Report on Follow-up Process and Repeat Audit Findings
(Added - 11/18/2021 12:06 PM)
OLA: Summary of Audit Reports and Recommended Committee Action
(Added - 11/18/2021 12:06 PM)

Click to return on the top page