Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement – Minority Business Enterprises and Veteran–Owned Small Business Enterprises – Participation Goal Scorecard
Sponsored by
Senator Ellis
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor's Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs to develop a scorecard to evaluate units of State government on the units' performance toward meeting certain participation goals under the Minority Business Enterprise Program and the Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprise Program; establishing a certain grading scale for the scorecard; and requiring grades achieved by each unit to be published each year on the Office's website.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0816
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2023
Legislative Date
2/03/2023
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2023
Legislative Date
2/06/2023
Action
Reassigned to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2023
Legislative Date
2/09/2023
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2023
Legislative Date
3/15/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/08/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {743523/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/08/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/10/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/12/2023
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/20/2023
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2023
Legislative Date
3/30/2023
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2023
Legislative Date
3/19/2023
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2023
Legislative Date
3/22/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-1)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2023
Legislative Date
3/22/2023
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2023
Legislative Date
4/24/2023
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2023 2/03/2023 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Procurement – Minority Business Enterprises and Veteran–Owned Small Business Enterprises – Participation Goal Scorecard
Senate 2/06/2023 2/06/2023 Reassigned to Budget and Taxation 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2023 2/09/2023 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2023 3/15/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2023 3/08/2023 Favorable with Amendments {743523/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2023 3/08/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Procurement – Minority Business Enterprises and Veteran–Owned Small Business Enterprises – Participation Goal Scorecard
Senate 3/17/2023 3/10/2023 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2023 3/12/2023 Referred Health and Government Operations 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2023 3/20/2023 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2023 3/30/2023 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2023 3/19/2023 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2023 3/22/2023 Third Reading Passed (138-1) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2023 3/22/2023 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/24/2023 4/24/2023 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Text - Chapter - Procurement – Minority Business Enterprises and Veteran–Owned Small Business Enterprises – Participation Goal Scorecard
Last Updated: 6/9/2023 3:07 PM
Click to return on the top page