Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses – Driver Skills Examinations
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Motor Vehicle Administration to establish a pilot program in Howard County and Montgomery County to allow certain drivers' schools to administer the driver skills examination required for an individual to obtain certain driver's licenses; requiring the drivers' school to have been licensed and in operation for at least 5 years before the date of application for authorization to administer the examination; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses – Driver Skills Examinations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {543229/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses – Driver Skills Examinations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses – Driver Skills Examinations
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Favorable with Amendments {543229/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses – Driver Skills Examinations
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2022 3/16/2022 Referred Environment and Transportation 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:01 PM
Click to return on the top page