Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Evidence - Admissibility of Creative Expression
Sponsored by
Senator Charles
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the creative expression of a criminal defendant or juvenile respondent is not admissible against the defendant or respondent unless the court makes certain findings; and defining "creative expression" as the expression or application of creativity or imagination in the production or arrangement of forms, sounds, words, movements, or symbols.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1429
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2024
Legislative Date
1/29/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Evidence - Admissibility of Creative Expression
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2024
Legislative Date
2/19/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2024
Legislative Date
2/19/2024
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2024 1/29/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Evidence - Admissibility of Creative Expression
Senate 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2024 2/19/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/19/2024 2/19/2024 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:55 PM
Click to return on the top page