Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining - Supervisory Employees
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Defining "supervisory employee" to clarify provisions of law relating to collective bargaining rights for certain community college employees as an employee who is authorized to hire, transfer, suspend, lay off, recall, promote, discharge, reward, or discipline employees, responsibly direct employees for more than 50% of the employee's working hours, or address and resolve the grievances of employees.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2024
Legislative Date
1/29/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining - Supervisory Employees
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2024
Legislative Date
2/16/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
4/01/2024
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2024 1/29/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining - Supervisory Employees
Senate 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/16/2024 2/16/2024 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2024 4/01/2024 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:56 PM
Click to return on the top page