Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Planning – Preservation of Agricultural Land – Goal
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a State goal of preserving a total of 1,030,000 acres of productive agricultural land by 2030 through the Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation, the Maryland GreenPrint Program, the Rural Legacy Program, the Maryland Environmental Trust, the Next Generation Farmland Acquisition Program, and local land preservation programs; and declaring the intent of the General Assembly that the Act is intended to extend the deadline to meet the State's goal for preservation from 2022 to 2030 and to include certain acreage.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0860
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Planning – Preservation of Agricultural Land – Goal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {674539/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Planning – Preservation of Agricultural Land – Goal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
4/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {380618/1
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 04/06 (Delegate Barve) Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {380618/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
41AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - State Planning – Preservation of Agricultural Land – Goal
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Planning – Preservation of Agricultural Land – Goal
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Favorable with Amendments {674539/1 Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Planning – Preservation of Agricultural Land – Goal
Senate 3/16/2021 2/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Referred Environment and Transportation 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 4/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments {380618/1 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Motion Special Order until 04/06 (Delegate Barve) Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Favorable with Amendments {380618/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 41AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Planning – Preservation of Agricultural Land – Goal
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 1:31 PM
Click to return on the top page