Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Participation in the Readiness and Environmental Protection Integration Program
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring agricultural land preservation easements to be included as part of a partnership formed under the Readiness and Environmental Protection Integration Program under specified circumstances.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {970712/1 Adopted
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Participation in the Readiness and Environmental Protection Integration Program
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Participation in the Readiness and Environmental Protection Integration Program
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments {970712/1 Adopted 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Participation in the Readiness and Environmental Protection Integration Program
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Text - Chapter - Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Participation in the Readiness and Environmental Protection Integration Program
(   2-513 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page