Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 1/28/2022 10:34:37 PM
Friday, January 28, 2022
Senate
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Created: 1/5/2022 3:58 PM
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
11:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
10:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube

Health and Human Services Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Created: 1/5/2022 3:58 PM
Health and Human Services Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
11:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
10:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube

Public Safety, Transportation, and Environment Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Created: 1/5/2022 3:58 PM
Public Safety, Transportation, and Environment Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
11:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube

Created: 1/26/2022 12:38 PM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Voting Session
9:30 AM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD

House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Anne Arundel
Created: 12/30/2021 3:15 PM
8:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Guests - Steuart Pittman, County Executive and Dr. Kalyanaraman, Health Officer

Baltimore County
Created: 1/25/2022 3:22 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing: Baltimore County Executive Johnny Olszewski, Jr.
Bill Hearings: HB302, HB332, HB333

Eastern Shore
Created: 12/29/2021 2:11 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Information and questions and answers from various organizations for members of the Eastern Shore Delegation and their constituents.

Frederick
Created: 1/19/2022 2:19 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Meeting Agenda
Members of the general public are invited to speak during the public comment portion of the meeting. Please request a Zoom link by 9:00 am on Wednesday at ken.kerr@house.state.md.us
You must specify the bill or bills you want to speak to or indicate that you want to make general public comment.
You will be given a participants' zoom link and admitted into the meeting when we reach that portion of the agenda. You will be invited to speak to the Delegation members for 2 minutes.
Voting on bills to be approved by Delegation.
(Added - 1/25/2022 2:36 PM)
Voting on bills to be approved by Delegation - detailed agenda will be forthcoming
(Removed - 1/25/2022 2:36 PM)

House Judicial Transparency Workgroup
Created: 1/27/2022 12:47 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Montgomery
Created: 1/24/2022 3:04 PM
8:30 AM - Zoom Meeting
Discussion of Legislation and other business relevant to Montgomery County.

No. 11 - Baltimore City
Created: 1/25/2022 7:49 AM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Baltimore City Delegation Virtual Bill Hearing
SB157- Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners-Student Members and Task Force to Study Compensation (Sen.Carter)
(Added - 1/25/2022 4:13 PM)
SB249-Baltimore City-Cigarettes, Other Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices- Local Laws Authorization (Sen. Hayes)
(Added - 1/25/2022 4:13 PM)
SB276-Baltimore City Public School Buildings-Notice of Demolition-Repeal (Sen. McCray)
(Added - 1/25/2022 4:13 PM)

No. 9 - Anne Arundel County
Created: 1/26/2022 11:30 AM
8:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Bi-weekly meeting of the Anne Arundel County Senate Delegation

Southern Maryland
Created: 1/25/2022 12:03 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Southern Maryland Delegation Organizational Meeting

Click to return on the top page