Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Comprehensive Conservation Finance Act
Sponsored by
Senators Rosapepe, Elfreth, Guzzone, Hester, Smith, Washington, and Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that Department of Agriculture, the Department of Natural Resources, and the Maryland Environmental Trust must allow participants in certain programs to participate in and receive compensation from certain markets, credits, or programs under certain circumstances; authorizing certain units to enter into pay-for-success contracts with certain aggregators to procure certain environmental outcomes projects or already certified environmental outcomes; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Comprehensive Conservation Finance Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {234738/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {904630/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Comprehensive Conservation Finance Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation Appropriations
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Comprehensive Conservation Finance Act
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Favorable with Amendments {234738/1 Adopted 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Floor Amendment {904630/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Comprehensive Conservation Finance Act
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Referred Environment and Transportation Appropriations 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2021 3/22/2021 Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
House 3/22/2021 3/22/2021 Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
House 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
(   8-702 )
(   1-701, 5-1401 through 5-1403, 5-509, 9-1601, 9-1602, 9-1604, 9-1605, 9-1605.1, 9-1622 )
(   1-110, 3-201, 5-102, 5-1607, 5-1610, 5-9A-05, 8-203, 8-207, 8-2A-01, 8-2A-03, 8-2A-04 )
(   10A-101, 13-101, 13-102, 13-112.1 )
Last Updated: 4/2/2021 6:05 PM
Click to return on the top page