Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing - Excess Real Property
Sponsored by
Senator Hettleman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Planning to provide a list of excess real property owned by the State to the Department of Housing and Community Development; requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to determine whether any of the listed properties are suitable for use or redevelopment as affordable housing; establishing the Rental Housing Fund; requiring the Comptroller to distribute $30,000,000 of income tax revenue from individuals to the Rental Housing Fund on or before June 30, 2022; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0927
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022, October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {393924/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {683428/1 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {693028/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-3)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2022
Legislative Date
5/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Housing and Community Development – Affordable Housing – Listing and Disposal of Excess Real Property
Senate 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Favorable with Amendments {393924/1 Adopted 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Floor Amendment {683428/1 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing - Excess Real Property
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Referred Environment and Transportation 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable with Amendments {693028/1 Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (134-3) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing - Excess Real Property
Post Passage 5/12/2022 5/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
Text - Chapter - Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing - Excess Real Property
(   2-605.2 )
Last Updated: 7/27/2022 11:43 AM
Click to return on the top page