Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Government Cybersecurity - Coordination and Operations (Local Cybersecurity Support Act of 2022)
Sponsored by
Senators Hester, Hershey, Jennings, Jackson, Rosapepe, Lee, and Watson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Establishing the Cyber Preparedness Unit in the Maryland Department of Emergency Management; establishing certain responsibilities of the Unit; requiring local governments to report certain cybersecurity incidents in a certain manner and under certain circumstances; requiring the State Security Operations Center to notify appropriate agencies of a cybersecurity incident in a certain manner; establishing the Office of Security Management within the Department of Information Technology and certain Office positions; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1202
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {513228/1
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {513228/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {153925/1 (Senator Hester) Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {503322/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-2)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {293328/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (105-26)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2022
Legislative Date
5/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Local Government Cybersecurity - Coordination and Operations (Local Cybersecurity Support Act of 2022)
Senate 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable with Amendments {513228/1 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable with Amendments {513228/1 Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Floor Amendment {153925/1 (Senator Hester) Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Floor Amendment {503322/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Local Government Cybersecurity - Coordination and Operations (Local Cybersecurity Support Act of 2022)
Senate 4/08/2022 3/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (44-2) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/01/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Favorable with Amendments {293328/1 Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (105-26) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Local Government Cybersecurity - Coordination and Operations (Local Cybersecurity Support Act of 2022)
Post Passage 5/12/2022 5/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Text - Chapter - Local Government Cybersecurity - Coordination and Operations (Local Cybersecurity Support Act of 2022)
(   3.5-101, 3.5-2A-01 through 3.5-2A-04, 3.5-301, 3.5-302, 3.5-303, 3.5-307, 3.5-309, 3.5-311, 3.5-315, 3.5-404, 3.5-405, 3A-101 through 3A-702,   4-308 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:05 PM
Click to return on the top page