Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Hunger-Free Campus Grant Program - Established
Sponsored by
Senator Washington
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 580
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Hunger-Free Campus Grant Program to address student hunger and basic food needs on campus; requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to administer the Program, develop a certain form, and designate certain campuses as hunger-free campuses; authorizing certain public institutions of higher education to develop certain procedures and make certain information publicly available; requiring the Governor, beginning in fiscal year 2023, to include in the annual budget bill a $150,000 appropriation for the Program; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0891
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Higher Education - Hunger-Free Campus Grant Program - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Higher Education - Hunger-Free Campus Grant Program - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
4/07/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {844061/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-41)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Higher Education - Hunger-Free Campus Grant Program - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 580
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Higher Education - Hunger-Free Campus Grant Program - Established
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Higher Education - Hunger-Free Campus Grant Program - Established
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Favorable Adopted 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Second Reading Passed 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Higher Education - Hunger-Free Campus Grant Program - Established
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Referred Appropriations 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 4/07/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Favorable with Amendments {844061/1 Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (95-41) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Higher Education - Hunger-Free Campus Grant Program - Established
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 580
Text - Chapter - Higher Education - Hunger-Free Campus Grant Program - Established
(   11-1701 through 11-1706 )
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:08 PM
Click to return on the top page