Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Uniform Disposition of Abandoned Property Act – Maryland 529 Program – Exemption
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - State Treasurer)
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting certain accounts under the Maryland 529 Program from the provisions of the Maryland Uniform Disposition of Abandoned Property Act.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1150
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/08/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {883228/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
4/08/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Maryland Uniform Disposition of Abandoned Property Act – Maryland 529 Program – Exemption
Senate 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2024 3/08/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/11/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable with Amendments {883228/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2024 2/26/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Uniform Disposition of Abandoned Property Act – Maryland 529 Program – Exemption
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Referred Appropriations 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/16/2024 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 4/08/2024 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/26/2024 Returned Passed 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/16/2024 11:11 AM
Click to return on the top page