Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits
Sponsored by
Senators Hester and Gallion
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 359
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing certain provisions relating to brewing company, winery, and distillery off-site permits; establishing a manufacturer's off-site permit with certain privileges; authorizing the Alcohol and Tobacco Commission to issue a brewery special event permit; altering the volumes of beer that the holders of certain licenses may produce and distribute annually; authorizing holders of certain manufacturer's licenses to sell and deliver products produced under the holder's license to individuals located in the State; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1232
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {774733/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {403993/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 359
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Favorable with Amendments {774733/1 Adopted 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Referred Economic Matters 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/31/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable with Amendments {403993/1 Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2021 3/16/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 3/12/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 3/12/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 3/12/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 359
Text - Chapter - Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits
Last Updated: 5/21/2021 12:31 PM
Click to return on the top page