Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Financing Transactions - Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Kramer
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that certain revenue, fees, and examination and investigation fees and assessments relating to commercial financing transactions be credited to the Nondepository Special Fund; regulating commercial financing transactions, including by establishing requirements related to disclosures, calculations of annual percentage rates, terms of repayments, and other related items, and the extension of special offers; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1211
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Consumer Credit - Commercial Financing Transactions
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {103929/1
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {103929/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Commercial Financing Transactions - Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Consumer Credit - Commercial Financing Transactions
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Favorable with Amendments {103929/1 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Favorable with Amendments {103929/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Commercial Financing Transactions - Requirements
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Referred Economic Matters 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
(   12-1101 through 12-1115 )
Last Updated: 4/5/2022 4:20 PM
Click to return on the top page