Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program - Power to the People Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 454
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Office of Home Energy Programs, in coordination with the United Way of Central Maryland and the Fuel Fund of Maryland, to establish the Power to the People Pilot Program on or before July 1, 2022, to expand access to the Critical Medical Needs Program; requiring the Pilot Program to provide training for certain individuals in the Critical Medical Needs Program; requiring the United Way of Central Maryland to develop a certain screening intake process; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0969
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1024 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {443492/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (103-30)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 454
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program - Power to the People Pilot Program
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Favorable Adopted 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Second Reading Passed 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program - Power to the People Pilot Program
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Referred Economic Matters 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2021 3/29/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/30/2021 3/14/2021 Favorable with Amendments {443492/1 Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/14/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/15/2021 Third Reading Passed (103-30) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program - Power to the People Pilot Program
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 454
Text - Chapter - Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program - Power to the People Pilot Program
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:06 PM
Click to return on the top page