Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Office of the Attorney General - Rights of Residents of Health Care Facilities - Injunctive Relief and Penalties
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Office of the Attorney General)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Attorney General to seek injunctive relief on behalf of the State on the basis of an imminent or ongoing violation of certain rights of residents of certain health care facilities; authorizing the Attorney General to request a court to impose a certain civil penalty not to exceed $10,000 on an assisted living program for certain violations; and requiring that the resident bill of rights for assisted living program residents include certain rights.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0723
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2024
Legislative Date
2/17/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2024
Legislative Date
2/17/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Office of the Attorney General - Rights of Residents of Health Care Facilities - Injunctive Relief and Penalties
Senate 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/17/2024 2/17/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/17/2024 2/17/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 2:01 PM
Click to return on the top page