Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Condemnation of Land Under Easement
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 622
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the statutory formula that determines the compensation required to be paid to the Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Fund on condemnation of land under a certain easement held by the Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation; requiring the Foundation to distribute a portion of certain compensation to a certain entity under certain circumstances; altering the definition of "economic or residential development"; and applying the Act.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 30, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {600719/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 622
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Condemnation of Land Under Easement
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Second Reading Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Condemnation of Land Under Easement
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments {600719/1 Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Condemnation of Land Under Easement
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 622
Text - Chapter - Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Condemnation of Land Under Easement
(   2-515 )
(   12-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page