Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Nursing Home Administrator - Qualifications
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing an exception to the requirement that an individual be licensed by the State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators before the individual may practice in this State for a person who holds a license in another state and has certain experience; altering the qualifications for applicants for a license to practice as a nursing home administrator; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Occupations - Nursing Home Administrator - Qualifications
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Health Occupations - Nursing Home Administrator - Qualifications
Senate 2/28/2022 3/01/2022 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2022 3/03/2022 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:09 PM
Click to return on the top page