Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Public Education Campaign on Prostate, Lung, and Breast Cancer Prevention
Sponsored by
Senators Augustine and A. Washington
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to develop, on or before December 1, 2026, a public education campaign on prostate, lung, and breast cancer prevention that targets communities disproportionately impacted by prostate, lung, and breast cancer; requiring the Department to implement the public education campaign on or before January 1, 2027; requiring the Governor, for fiscal years 2026 through 2030, to include an appropriation to the Department for the public education campaign from the Cigarette Restitution Fund; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1293
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2025
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {703528/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {153223/1 (Senator A. Washington) Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Department of Health - Public Education Campaign on Prostate, Lung, and Breast Cancer Prevention
Senate 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Favorable with Amendments {703528/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Floor Amendment {153223/1 (Senator A. Washington) Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Department of Health - Public Education Campaign on Prostate, Lung, and Breast Cancer Prevention
Senate 3/15/2024 3/03/2024 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/12/2024 Referred Health and Government Operations 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2024 3/28/2024 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/28/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2024 3/15/2024 Second Reading Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
(   13-11A-01 )
Last Updated: 4/8/2024 9:45 AM
Click to return on the top page