Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - Electronic Toll Collection Backlog - Fee Prohibition
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Maryland Transportation Authority from charging an administrative fee or a civil penalty for failure to pay video tolls for which processing or billing was delayed due to COVID-19 related-factors until 180 days after the Authority has eliminated the toll charge backlog; requiring the Authority to reimburse the registered owner of a motor vehicle that incurred a certain video toll the amount of any administrative fees or civil penalties paid; and applying the Act to certain video tolls incurred on or after March 5, 2020.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1435
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2022
Legislative Date
2/13/2022
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Transportation - Electronic Toll Collection Backlog - Fee Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2022 2/13/2022 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Transportation - Electronic Toll Collection Backlog - Fee Prohibition
Senate 2/28/2022 3/01/2022 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/02/2022 3/02/2022 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:10 PM
Click to return on the top page