Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electric Universal Service Program - Unexpended Funds
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Middleton, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Rosapepe, and Oaks
Status
Veto sustained (0-44)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that the Public Service Commission has oversight responsibility over specified expenditures of the electric universal service program; requiring the Department of Human Resources to expend specified funds collected for the program in specified fiscal years for specified purposes, including bill assistance and arrearage retirement, targeted weatherization, or arrearage management; and stating the intent of the General Assembly regarding the timing for expending specified unexpended bill assistance and arrearage funds.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1002
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Electric Universal Service Program - Unexpended Funds
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {637475/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Electric Universal Service Program - Unexpended Funds
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {433392/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-6)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Electric Universal Service Program - Unexpended Funds
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2017
Legislative Date
5/26/2017
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Veto sustained (0-44)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Electric Universal Service Program - Unexpended Funds
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments {637475/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Electric Universal Service Program - Unexpended Funds
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Referred Economic Matters 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Favorable with Amendments {433392/1 Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (132-6) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Electric Universal Service Program - Unexpended Funds
Post Passage 5/26/2017 5/26/2017 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Veto sustained (0-44)
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page