Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Watershed, Stream, and Floodplain Restoration - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Restoration and Stream and Floodplain Restoration Funding (Whole Watershed Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Elfreth, Hester, and Guzzone
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Stream Restoration Contractors Licensing Board; requiring a person to be licensed as a stream restoration contractor or be employed by an individual or entity that is licensed as a stream restoration contractor before the person performs or solicits to perform stream restoration contractor services in the State, subject to a certain exception; requiring the Department of the Environment to provide notice of a certain violation to a stream restoration contractor; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1165
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {123023/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/18 (Senator Hester) Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {243025/1 (Senator Elfreth) Adopted
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {723820/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/01 (Delegate Stein) Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {223320/1 (Delegate Love) Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (100-37)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Stream and Watershed Restoration – Stream Restoration Contractor Licensing and Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Restoration and Funding (Whole Watershed Act)
Senate 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/15/2024 3/03/2024 Favorable with Amendments {123023/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/03/2024 Motion Special Order until 3/18 (Senator Hester) Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Floor Amendment {243025/1 (Senator Elfreth) Adopted 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Stream and Watershed Restoration - Stream Restoration Contractor Licensing and Projects and Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Restoration and Funding (Whole Watershed Act)
Senate 3/18/2024 3/06/2024 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/12/2024 Referred Environment and Transportation 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2024 3/21/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/27/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable with Amendments {723820/1 Adopted 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2024 3/14/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2024 3/16/2024 Motion Special Order until 4/01 (Delegate Stein) Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2024 3/20/2024 Floor Amendment {223320/1 (Delegate Love) Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2024 3/20/2024 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (100-37) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Senate Concurs House Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Watershed, Stream, and Floodplain Restoration - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Restoration and Stream and Floodplain Restoration Funding (Whole Watershed Act)
(   18-101 through 18-103, 9-1605.2,   9-1605.4   )
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 4:10 PM
Click to return on the top page