Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Divestment From Russia
Sponsored by
Senator Elfreth (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions) and Senators Augustine, Bailey, Beidle, Benson, Carozza, Carter, Cassilly, Corderman, Eckardt, Edwards, Ellis, Ferguson, Gallion, Griffith, Guzzone, Hettleman, Hough, Jackson, Jennings, Kagan, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lam, Lee, McCray, Pinsky, Ready, Reilly, Rosapepe, Salling, Simonaire, Smith, Sydnor, Waldstreicher, Washington, West, Young, Zucker, Feldman, Hayes, Hershey, Hester, Kramer, Patterson, and Watson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 343
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to review investment holdings in certain eligible accounts to determine the extent to which funds are invested in Russia-restricted investments; requiring the Board of Trustees to take certain divestment actions; prohibiting the Board of Trustees from making certain new investments; providing certain immunities from liability for certain persons; requiring the Board of Trustees to act in good faith in taking certain actions in a certain manner; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1482
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Retirement and Pension System - Divestment From Russia
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 10:45 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 12:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {233626/1 (Senator Zucker) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Retirement and Pension System - Divestment From Russia
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:40 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2022
Legislative Date
5/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 343
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Retirement and Pension System - Divestment From Russia
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/25/2022 2/25/2022 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - State Retirement and Pension System - Divestment From Russia
Senate 3/09/2022 3/10/2022 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/10/2022 3/10/2022 Hearing 3/11 at 10:45 a.m.
Senate 3/10/2022 3/10/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/10/2022 3/10/2022 Hearing 3/11 at 12:45 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Favorable Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Floor Amendment {233626/1 (Senator Zucker) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Retirement and Pension System - Divestment From Russia
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Referred Appropriations 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2022 3/20/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing canceled
House 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:40 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/05/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Returned Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/12/2022 5/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 343
Text - Chapter - State Retirement and Pension System - Divestment From Russia
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:11 PM
Click to return on the top page