Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Protecting Opportunities and Regional Trade (PORT) Act
Sponsored by
Senators Ferguson and Salling
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Fallen Transportation Workers Scholarship Program and the Fallen Transportation Workers Scholarship Fund to provide tuition assistance to a student who was a dependent or is the surviving spouse of a fallen transportation worker; requiring the Maryland Department of Labor and the Department of Commerce to establish programs to assist individuals and certain entities impacted by the reduced operations of the Port of Baltimore; authorizing the Secretary of Labor to alter certain unemployment eligibility requirements; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1526
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Protecting Opportunities and Regional Trade (PORT) Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
4/03/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {163929/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Protecting Opportunities and Regional Trade (PORT) Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
4/08/2024
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
4/08/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {593120/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-2)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Protecting Opportunities and Regional Trade (PORT) Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2024
Legislative Date
4/09/2024
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Protecting Opportunities and Regional Trade (PORT) Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/29/2024 3/14/2024 First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2024 3/14/2024 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2024 3/14/2024 Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - First - Maryland Protecting Opportunities and Regional Trade (PORT) Act
Senate 3/29/2024 3/29/2024 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 4/03/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Favorable with Amendments {163929/1 Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Protecting Opportunities and Regional Trade (PORT) Act
Senate 4/03/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/22/2024 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 4/08/2024 Rereferred to Economic Matters and Appropriations
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 4/08/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Favorable with Amendments {593120/1 Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/29/2024 Third Reading Passed (130-2) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Senate Concurs House Amendments 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Protecting Opportunities and Regional Trade (PORT) Act
Post Passage 4/09/2024 4/09/2024 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3
Text - Chapter - Maryland Protecting Opportunities and Regional Trade (PORT) Act
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/17/2024 9:34 AM
Click to return on the top page