Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Unattended Dogs - Extreme Weather Conditions and Heat
Sponsored by
Delegates Lehman, Bagnall, Belcastro, Boyce, Krimm, Ruth, and Solomon
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from leaving a dog outside and unattended for longer than 30 minutes without access to continuous suitable shelter or suitable shade during certain weather conditions or temperatures, subject to certain exceptions; defining "extreme weather conditions" as temperatures below 32 degrees Fahrenheit or above 90 degrees or during an active weather warning; making a violation a civil offense; applying penalties ranging from a warning for a first violation to a fine of up to $1,000 for a third or subsequent offense; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0044
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0081 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/09/2021
Legislative Date
9/09/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Crimes - Unattended Dogs - Extreme Weather Conditions and Heat
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/06/2022
Legislative Date
1/06/2022
Action
Hearing 1/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/09/2021 9/09/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Crimes - Unattended Dogs - Extreme Weather Conditions and Heat
House 1/06/2022 1/06/2022 Hearing 1/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/17/2022 4:05 PM
Click to return on the top page