Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Paint Stewardship
Sponsored by
Delegate Boyce
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring producers of architectural paint or a representative organization to submit a plan for the establishment of a Paint Stewardship Program to the Department of the Environment on or before January 1, 2023, and in accordance with certain requirements; requiring the Department to review and approve certain plans, including a certain assessment, submitted in accordance with the Paint Stewardship Program; prohibiting the sale of certain architectural paint under certain circumstances beginning on a certain date; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0143
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0127 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/26/2021
Legislative Date
10/26/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Paint Stewardship
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/26/2021 10/26/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Text - First - Maryland Paint Stewardship
House 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Last Updated: 1/12/2022 3:25 PM
Click to return on the top page