Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Animal Welfare - Declawing Cats - Prohibited Acts
Sponsored by
Delegates Charkoudian, Belcastro, Boyce, R. Lewis, Ruth, and Terrasa
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a veterinary practitioner from performing certain declawing procedures on a cat unless the procedure is necessary for a therapeutic purpose; requiring the State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners to refuse, suspend, or revoke any application or license, and censure or place on probation any licensee after a hearing if the veterinary practitioner fails to comply with the prohibition; and prohibiting a person from performing certain declawing procedures on a cat.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0067
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0445 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/30/2021
Legislative Date
9/30/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Animal Welfare - Declawing Cats - Prohibited Acts
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/30/2021 9/30/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Animal Welfare - Declawing Cats - Prohibited Acts
House 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
(   10-625.1 )
Last Updated: 1/13/2022 1:47 PM
Click to return on the top page