Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Personal Information - State and Local Agencies - Restrictions on Access (Maryland Driver Privacy Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Stein
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring an officer, an employee, an agent, or a contractor of the State or a political subdivision to deny inspection by a federal agency seeking access for certain immigration enforcement matters of a public record that contains personal information or certain photographic images unless a valid warrant is provided; prohibiting certain persons from disclosing certain information to a federal agent or a federal agency under certain circumstances; requiring a certain annual report to the General Assembly; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0234
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/13/2020
Legislative Date
7/13/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
Reassigned to Judiciary Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
4 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {322217/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (86-47)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {368374/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-14)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-42)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2021
Legislative Date
5/26/2021
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/13/2020 7/13/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Personal Information - State and Local Agencies - Restrictions on Access
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 Hearing 1/27 at 2:30 p.m.
House 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 Reassigned to Judiciary Environment and Transportation 4 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments {322217/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Personal Information - State and Local Agencies - Restrictions on Access (Maryland Driver Privacy Act)
House 3/22/2021 3/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (86-47) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments {368374/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Third Reading Passed (32-14) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (97-42) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Personal Information - State and Local Agencies - Restrictions on Access (Maryland Driver Privacy Act)
Post Passage 5/26/2021 5/26/2021 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Last Updated: 5/27/2021 10:41 AM
Click to return on the top page