Committee Testimony and Witness Signup
HB0023 - Property Taxes - Authority of Counties to Establish a Subclass and Set a Special Rate for Commercial and Industrial Property
Ways and Means 1/28/2025 1:00:00 PM
Budget and Taxation 3/27/2025 1:00:00 PM
As of: 5/8/2025 11:54:06 PM
Name | Organization | Position | Testimony | Committee |
---|---|---|---|---|
Delegate Fair, Delegate Fair | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
W&M | |
Kinnally, Kevin | Maryland Association of Counties (MACo) | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony HB0023-WM_MACo_SUP.pdf |
W&M |
Kinsey, Kathy | Mobilize Frederick | FAV | MF_HB 23_ Special Property Tax Rates.docx.pdf | W&M |
McGee, Christa | Maryland Realtors | UNF | HB 23 - Property Taxes - Subclass and Rate for Com | W&M |
Madaleno, Richard | Montgomery County Government | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
W&M |
Fink, Nelda | UNF | No Testimony | W&M | |
Smalls, Cindy | AFSCME | FAV | HB23-AFSCME-FAV.pdf | W&M |
Hunt, Ethan | Anne Arundel County | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony Anne Arundel County _FAV_HB23.pdf |
W&M |
Fitzwater, Jessica | Frederick County Executive | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony HB 23, FAV, FCG, OCE, JF, LS24.pdf |
W&M |
Lang, Alan | UNF |
In Person - Oral Testimony 2025 HB0023 Testimony Against 2025-01-28.pdf |
W&M | |
Kaplowitz, Richard KAP | Year | FAV | Testimony in support of HB0023 - Property Taxes - | W&M |
Griffin, Andrew | Associated Utility Contractors of Maryland | UNF | HCCC_HB 23_Special Rate Commercial & Industrial Pr | W&M |
Williams, Peggy | UNF | No Testimony | W&M | |
Enten, robert | Maryland Building Industry Assoc | UNF |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
W&M |
Popham, Bryson | Bryson F. Popham, P.A. | UNF |
HB 23_BOMA_UNF.pdf
INFO |
W&M |
Ballentine, Tom | NAIOP Maryland | UNF | HB0023- Property Tax - Authority to Set Special Ra | W&M |
Elrich, Marc | Montgomery County Government | FAV | HB 23 - MoCo_Elrich_FAV (GA 25).pdf | W&M |
Graf, Lori | Maryland Building Industry Association | UNF | MBIA Letter of Opposition HB 23.pdf | W&M |
Price, Sarah | Maryland Retailers Alliance | UNF | HB23_MRA_UNF.pdf | W&M |
Coren, Ellen | Greater Bethesda Chamber of Commerce | UNF |
Virtual - Oral Testimony |
W&M |
Zwerling, Samantha | Maryland State Education Association | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony HB23 - FAV - MSEA.pdf |
W&M |
Phillips, Daniel | Department of Assessments and Taxation | INFO | HB0023_WM_LOI.docx.pdf | W&M |
a, a | UNF | ICSC HB23 UNF TestimonyF.pdf | W&M | |
Wiggins, Grason | UNF |
In Person - Oral Testimony MDCC_HB_23_UNFAV.pdf |
W&M | |
McCauley, Kirk | WMDA - service station, convenience stores and repair facilities | UNF | HB23 testimony.pdf | W&M |
Anleu, Brian | UNF |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
W&M | |
Kohler-Frueh, Leila | Habitat for Humanity of the Chesapeake | FAV | HB59_Support.pdf | W&M |
Schumitz, Kali | Maryland Center on Economic Policy | FAV | HB 23_MD Center on Economic Policy_FAV.pdf | W&M |
Anleu, Brian | Apartment and Office Building Association of Metropolitan Washington | UNF | UNF HB23 | W&M |
Popham, Bryson | INFO | No Testimony | W&M | |
Delegate Fair, Delegate Fair | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
B&T | |
Madaleno, Richard | Montgomery County Government | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
B&T |
Hunt, Ethan | Anne Arundel County | FAV | Anne Arundel County _B&T_FAV_HB23.pdf | B&T |
Lang, Alan | UNF | 2025 HB0023 Testimony Against 2025-03-26.pdf | B&T | |
McGee, Christa | Maryland Realtors | UNF | HB 23 - Property Taxes - Subclass and Rate for Com | B&T |
Zwerling, Samantha | Maryland State Education Association | FAV | XHB23_MSEA_Zwerling_FAV.pdf | B&T |
Fitzwater, Jessica | Frederick County Executive | FAV | HB 23, FAV, FCG, OCE, JF, LS25, BT.pdf | B&T |
Kaplowitz, Richard KAP | Year | FWA | HB0023 crossover FWA - Property Taxes - Authority | B&T |
Bagwell, Ashlie | UNF | No Testimony | B&T | |
Levine, Brian | Montgomery County Chamber of Commerce | UNF | HB0023 -- Property Taxes - Authority of Counties t | B&T |
Kinnally, Kevin | Maryland Association of Counties (MACo) | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony HB0023-BT_MACo_SUP.pdf |
B&T |
Griffin, Andrew | Maryland Chamber of Commerce | UNF | HCCC_HB 23_UNFAV_B&T.pdf | B&T |
Wieland, Tom | Ritchie Pharmacy , Brooklyn Park, Md. | UNF | DO NOT SUPPORT OF BILL20250321_11240737.pdf | B&T |
Popham, Bryson | Bryson F. Popham, P.A. | UNF | HB 23_BOMA 2__UNF.pdf | B&T |
Sacks, Dawn | FAV | No Testimony | B&T | |
Benhoff, Jean | UNF | No Testimony | B&T | |
Day, Jake | Department of Housing and Community Development | FWA | HB023_DHCD_SUPPORT_W_AMD.pdf | B&T |
Wiggins, Grason | UNF |
In Person - Oral Testimony MDCC_HB 23_Unfavorable.pdf |
B&T | |
Elrich, Marc | Montgomery County Government | FAV | HB 23 - MoCo_Elrich_FAV (GA 25) (Senate).pdf | B&T |
Fair, Kris | Maryland General Assembly | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony HB23 Written Testimony - Senate Version.pdf |
B&T |
Cantu, Hugo | Apartments and Office Building Association | UNF |
In Person - Oral Testimony AOBA_HB23_UNF_SENATE.pdf |
B&T |
Ballentine, Tom | NAIOP Maryland | UNF |
In Person - Oral Testimony HB 23 - Special Tax Rates - Commercial Property - |
B&T |
Testimony, All | N/A | Merged Testimony as of 3-26-2025 at 910 AM | B&T |
Validation
Please fix the following:
MyMGA
Accessibility Tools