Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron, Hettleman, Korman, Moon, Pendergrass, Pena-Melnyk, Bagnall, Bhandari, Carr, Charles, Chisholm, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kelly, Kerr, Kipke, Krebs, R. Lewis, Metzgar, Morgan, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, instead of authorizing, the Prescription Drug Monitoring Program to review prescription monitoring data for indications of a possible misuse or abuse of a monitored prescription drug; requiring the Program to report the possible misuse or abuse to the prescriber or dispenser of the monitored prescription drug and to provide certain education to the prescriber or dispenser; authorizing the Program to provide prescription monitoring data to the Office of Controlled Substances Administration for further investigation; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0195
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0088 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/11/2018
Legislative Date
9/11/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {866983/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {367970/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/11/2018 9/11/2018 Pre-filed
House 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments {866983/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Finance 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable with Amendments {367970/1 Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Text - Chapter - Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions
(   21-2A-01, 21-2A-02, 21-2A-04, 21-2A-05, 21-2A-06, 21-2A-07 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page