Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pharmacists - Aids for the Cessation of Tobacco Product Use
Sponsored by
Delegates Bhandari and R. Lewis
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 4:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a pharmacist who meets the requirements of regulations adopted by the State Board of Pharmacy to prescribe and dispense nicotine replacement therapy medications approved by the U.S. Food and Drug Administration as aids for the cessation of the use of tobacco products.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0062
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1594 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/29/2021
Legislative Date
10/29/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Pharmacists - Aids for the Cessation of Tobacco Product Use
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 4:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 4:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/29/2021 10/29/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Pharmacists - Aids for the Cessation of Tobacco Product Use
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 Hearing 1/20 at 2:30 p.m.
House 1/20/2022 1/19/2022 Hearing canceled
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 Hearing 1/20 at 4:00 p.m.
House 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 Hearing canceled
House 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 Hearing 1/20 at 4:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/20/2022 3:53 PM
Click to return on the top page