Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Contraband Tobacco Products and Conveyances - Seizures and Disposition
Sponsored by
Delegate McDermott
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the manner in which seized contraband tobacco products or specified conveyances are processed following seizure; authorizing the Comptroller to destroy, or authorize a political subdivision to destroy, contraband tobacco products or conveyances seized and forfeited under specified circumstances; and requiring the Comptroller to remove or authorize a political subdivision to destroy specified seized contraband tobacco products and conveyances on or before December 1, 2014.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0147 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
11/15/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2014
Legislative Date
1/14/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 11/15/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/14/2014 1/14/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2014 3/15/2014 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
(   13-836, 13-841 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page