Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Maryland Suicide Fatality Review Committee
Sponsored by
Delegate Belcastro
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Suicide Fatality Review Committee; providing that a person has immunity from liability for certain actions related to the Committee; providing for the sharing of information with and confidentiality of information obtained by the Committee; exempting Committee meetings from the Open Meetings Act; and prohibiting certain persons from testifying in any proceeding about details of a Committee meeting.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0094
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0209 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/01/2021
Legislative Date
11/01/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Maryland Suicide Fatality Review Committee
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2022
Legislative Date
1/11/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/01/2021 11/01/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Maryland Suicide Fatality Review Committee
House 1/11/2022 1/11/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 2:30 p.m.
(   5-1001 through 5-1009 )
Last Updated: 1/14/2022 5:15 PM
Click to return on the top page