Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Nurse Anesthetists - Drug Authority and Collaboration
Sponsored by
Delegate Cullison
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing a nurse anesthetist to prescribe, order, and administer drugs, including controlled dangerous substances, without obtaining approval from a practitioner with whom the nurse anesthetist collaborates, subject to certain limitations; and authorizing a nurse anesthetist to collaborate with a podiatrist.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0312
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/29/2021
Legislative Date
10/29/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/29/2021 10/29/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Occupations - Nurse Anesthetists - Drug Authority and Collaboration
House 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/20/2022 5:44 AM
Click to return on the top page