Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Rate Filings - Trade Secrets and Factors Used to Establish Rates
Sponsored by
Delegate Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing certain confidentiality protections for proprietary rate-related information; and prohibiting an insurer that uses territory as a factor in establishing automobile insurance rates from using more than five territories.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/01/2021
Legislative Date
11/01/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2022
Legislative Date
1/11/2022
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/01/2021 11/01/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Insurance - Rate Filings - Trade Secrets and Factors Used to Establish Rates
House 1/11/2022 1/11/2022 Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/13/2022 2:51 PM
Click to return on the top page