Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 1/27/2022 10:02:16 AM
Thursday, January 27, 2022
Thursday, January 27, 2022
Senate
Finance Committee
Change made: January 27, 2022 9:48 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
February 8, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0166
Sen Ellis

Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Doula Program
ADDED: 9:48 AM

House
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee
Change made: January 27, 2022 8:40 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
February 9, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
MSDE Accountability and Implemenation Board
REMOVED: 8:40 AM

Change made: January 27, 2022 8:42 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
March 9, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
MSDE Accountability and Implemenation Board
ADDED: 8:42 AM

Environment and Transportation Committee
Change made: January 27, 2022 9:23 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 10, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0073
Del R. Lewis

Baltimore City – Complete Streets and Safe Routes to School Programs – Funding
ADDED: 9:23 AM
HB0434
Del Wells

Motor Vehicles - Speed Limits - Establishment and Enforcement
ADDED: 9:23 AM

Change made: January 27, 2022 9:30 AM - HEARING ADDED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 15, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0396
PG Co Deleg and Mont Co Deleg

Montgomery County Planning Board - Open Meetings - Video and Audio Streaming and Minutes PG/MC 101-22
HB0397
PG Co Deleg and Mont Co Deleg

Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Montgomery County - County Council and District Council - Voting Thresholds PG/MC 100-22
HB0400
PG Co Deleg and Mont Co Deleg

Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Hiring and Promotion Preferences - Veterans and Their Spouses PG/MC 106-22
HB0401
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George's County - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies PG 403-22

Change made: January 27, 2022 9:35 AM - HEARING ADDED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 17, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0326
Del Williams, et al

State Finance - Prohibited Appropriations - Magnetic Levitation Transportation System

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: January 27, 2022 9:57 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
January 27, 2022 4:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: January 27, 2022 2:30 PM)
Zoom / YouTube
HB0106
Del Cullison

Health Insurance - Nonprofit Health Service Plan - Board of Directors
HB0119
Del Qi

Insurance – Annuities – Nonforfeiture – Interest Rate
HB0142
Del Amprey

Health Insurance - Coverage of In Vitro Fertilization - Revisions

Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee
Change made: January 27, 2022 9:15 AM - HEARING ADDED
Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee - Work Session
January 31, 2022 10:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
- HB32

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: January 27, 2022 8:53 AM - HEARING ADDED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
February 10, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0314
Del Novotny

County Boards of Education – Voting Members – Requirements
HB0334
Del Impallaria

Harford County Board of Education - Alterations, Vacancy Procedures, and Funding for Independent Positions
HB0336
Del Impallaria

Harford County - County Superintendent - Election and Recall Procedures and Compensation
HB0347
Del Boteler, et al

Baltimore County - County Superintendent - Election and Recall Procedures and Compensation
HB0352
Del Qi, et al

Education - American Studies and Social Equity Standards Advisory Board - Academic Standards and Model Policy
HB0354
PG Co Deleg

Prince George's County - Nonschool Use of Public School Facilities PG 505-22
HB0355
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George's County - Workgroup on the Membership and Operation of the Prince George's County Board of Education PG 503-22
HB0376
Del Guyton, et al

Outdoor Preschool License Pilot Program - Establishment
HB0380
Montgomery County Delegation

Montgomery County Board of Education – Election of Members MC 04–22
HB0383
Dels Korman and Solomon

Young Readers Programs – Establishment (Young Readers Program Expansion Act)

Other
Maryland Community Health Resources Commission
Change made: January 27, 2022 8:23 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Community Health Resources Commission - Other
February 1, 2022 10:00 AM
Virtual Meeting
Regular Meeting of the Maryland Health Resources Commission

Click to return on the top page