Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Plumbing Act - Non-Water-Conserving Fixtures and Devices - Repeal of Criminal Penalties for Sale or Installation
Sponsored by
Delegate J. Lewis
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 343
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing certain criminal penalties for a violation of certain prohibitions against selling or installing a certain plumbing-related fixture or other device that is not water-conserving.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/24/2017
Legislative Date
7/24/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2018
Legislative Date
1/23/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 343
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/24/2017 7/24/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Maryland Plumbing Act - Non-Water-Conserving Fixtures and Devices - Repeal of Criminal Penalties for Sale or Installation
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 1/23/2018 1/23/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Plumbing Act - Non-Water-Conserving Fixtures and Devices - Repeal of Criminal Penalties for Sale or Installation
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Referred Finance 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Returned Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 343
Text - Chapter - Maryland Plumbing Act - Non-Water-Conserving Fixtures and Devices - Repeal of Criminal Penalties for Sale or Installation
(   12-101, 12-605, 12-607 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page