Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts – Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the conditions under which a lawsuit is considered a strategic lawsuit against public participation (SLAPP suit); altering the conditions under which a defendant in a SLAPP suit is not civilly liable for certain communications; and establishing certain standards and requirements relating to a motion to dismiss an alleged SLAPP suit.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0315
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0308 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/26/2021
Legislative Date
7/26/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Courts – Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2022
Legislative Date
1/07/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/26/2021 7/26/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Courts – Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
House 1/07/2022 1/07/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/21/2022 5:05 PM
Click to return on the top page