Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 9/29/2022 12:57:09 PM
Thursday, September 29, 2022
Thursday, September 29, 2022
Other
Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee
Change made: September 29, 2022 7:20 AM - HEARING ADDED
Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee - Other
November 15, 2022 10:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
TBD

Change made: September 29, 2022 7:22 AM - HEARING ADDED
Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee - Other
December 6, 2022 10:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
TBD

School Construction, Interagency Commission on
Change made: September 29, 2022 12:00 PM - HEARING ADDED
School Construction, Interagency Commission on - Other
October 13, 2022 9:00 AM
Virtual Meeting
Public virtual meeting to discuss normal IAC business.

Click to return on the top page