Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law – Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Charkoudian
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering certain provisions related to the payment of wages, including the application, penalty, and enforcement provisions of the Maryland Wage and Hour Law and the Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law, the provision of information related to the payment of wages by employers to employees, and adverse actions by an employer.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0078
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1097 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/29/2021
Legislative Date
10/29/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/29/2021 10/29/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law – Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act)
House 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 Hearing canceled
Last Updated: 1/19/2022 3:30 PM
Click to return on the top page