Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Discrimination in Employment - Reasonable Accommodations for Applicants With Disabilities
Sponsored by
Delegates Rogers and Charkoudian
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an employer from failing or refusing to make a certain accommodation for a known disability of an otherwise qualified applicant for employment; and establishing that an employer is not required to accommodate an applicant for employment's disability under certain circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/30/2021
Legislative Date
9/30/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/30/2021 9/30/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Discrimination in Employment - Reasonable Accommodations for Applicants With Disabilities
House 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/19/2022 11:58 AM
Click to return on the top page