Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 8/3/2021 6:49:14 PM
Tuesday, August 3, 2021
Tuesday, August 3, 2021
House
Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: August 3, 2021 1:07 PM - HEARING ADDED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
August 6, 2021 2:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
- Medicaid and administrative day rate reimbursement for adult day care
- Developmental Disabilities Administration Appendix K changes
- Medicaid reimbursement for behavioral health services delivered via telehealth

Other
Justice Reinvestment Oversight Board
Change made: August 3, 2021 3:11 PM - HEARING ADDED
Justice Reinvestment Oversight Board - Other
August 12, 2021 1:30 PM
Maryland Stadium Authority, The Warehouse at Camden Yards, 333 West Camden Street, Suite 500, Baltimore, MD
Quarterly Meeting

Oral Health in Maryland, Task Force on
Change made: August 3, 2021 4:10 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Oral Health in Maryland, Task Force on - Other
September 14, 2021 2:30 PM
(Previous Date/Time: September 16, 2021 10:00 AM)
Zoom / YouTube
Meeting of the Task Force on Oral Health

Click to return on the top page