Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education – Crimes on School Grounds – Application
Sponsored by
Delegates Ruth, Amprey, Belcastro, Ebersole, Hill, Ivey, R. Lewis, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Stewart, Terrasa, and Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying that provisions of law prohibiting and penalizing disruptive and threatening behavior on the grounds of, in the classes of, or in the home of an employee of an institution of elementary, secondary, or higher education do not apply to students who commit offenses at the institution they attend, students on exclusionary discipline who commit offenses at the institution they attend, or students who commit offenses at another institution while attending a sporting event or other extracurricular program.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0119
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0700 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/13/2021
Legislative Date
10/13/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education – Crimes on School Grounds – Application
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2022
Legislative Date
1/05/2022
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/13/2021 10/13/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education – Crimes on School Grounds – Application
House 1/05/2022 1/05/2022 Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/24/2022 9:50 AM
Click to return on the top page